ME LD477 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-16 - (S) Subsequently Taken from the table by the President ProTem On motion by Senator GERZOFSKY of Cumberland Roll Call Ordered (Remarks Made) PASSED TO BE ENACTED Roll Call # 77 25 Yeas - 9 Nays- 1 Excused - 0 Absent
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-16 - (S) Subsequently Taken from the table by the President ProTem On motion by Senator GERZOFSKY of Cumberland Roll Call Ordered (Remarks Made) PASSED TO BE ENACTED Roll Call # 77 25 Yeas - 9 Nays- 1 Excused - 0 Absent
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating to Noise Violations by Motor Vehicles, Including Motorcycles
Title
An Act Relating to Noise Violations by Motor Vehicles, Including Motorcycles
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-16 | (S) Subsequently Taken from the table by the President ProTem On motion by Senator GERZOFSKY of Cumberland Roll Call Ordered (Remarks Made) PASSED TO BE ENACTED Roll Call # 77 25 Yeas - 9 Nays- 1 Excused - 0 Absent | |
2011-05-16 | (S) On motion by Senator ALFOND of Cumberland Tabled Later Today Assigned pending ENACTMENT | |
2011-05-16 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-05-16 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2011-05-12 | (S) Subsequently Taken from the table by the President PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED Roll Call # 69 26 Yeas - 9 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent | |
2011-05-12 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME On motion by Senator ALFOND of Cumberland Tabled Later Today Assigned pending PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-144) in concurrence Roll Call Ordered | |
2011-05-12 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Rosen, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2011-05-11 | (S) ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY | |
2011-05-11 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (H-144) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. | |
2011-05-11 | (S) READ ONCE | |
2011-05-11 | (S) Reports READ On motion by Senator COLLINS of York Majority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-144) Report ACCEPTED, in concurrence. | |
2011-05-10 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-05-10 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-144) | |
2011-05-10 | (H) READ the Second Time. | |
2011-05-10 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative RICHARDSON of Carmel, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2011-05-05 | (H) TOMORROW ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING. | |
2011-05-05 | (H) Committee Amendment "A" (H-144) was READ and ADOPTED. | |
2011-05-05 | (H) The Bill was READ ONCE. | |
2011-05-05 | (H) On motion of Representative CEBRA of Naples, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. | |
2011-05-05 | (H) Reports READ. | |
2011-02-10 | (S) On motion by Senator Collins of York, REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION and ordered printed, in concurrence. | |
2011-02-10 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-02-10 | (H) The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION. | |
2011-02-10 | (H) Committee on Transportation suggested and ordered printed. |