ME LD472 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Failed on June 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Failed on June 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Provide Meals to Homebound Individuals
Title
An Act To Provide Meals to Homebound Individuals
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-20 | Senate | In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD). |
2019-03-28 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-03-26 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-03-26 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-12), in concurrence. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-12) READ and ADOPTED |
2019-03-19 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2019-03-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-03-14 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-12). |
2019-03-14 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2019-03-14 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2019-01-29 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES in concurrence |
2019-01-29 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-01-29 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2019-01-29 | House | Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed. |