ME LD47 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-10 - Placed in the Legislative Files (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-10 - Placed in the Legislative Files (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, Directing the Department of Transportation To Remove One of the Proposed Routes from Consideration for the Interstate 395 and Route 9 Connector
Title
Resolve, Directing the Department of Transportation To Remove One of the Proposed Routes from Consideration for the Interstate 395 and Route 9 Connector
Sponsors
Rep. Arthur Verow [D] | Sen. Paul Davis [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-10 | Senate | Placed in the Legislative Files (DEAD). |
2015-03-10 | Senate | On motion by Senator COLLINS of York the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Reports READ. |
2015-03-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-03-05 | House | On motion of Representative McLEAN of Gorham, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2015-03-05 | House | Reports READ. |
2015-01-20 | Senate | On motion by Senator Collins of York, REFERRED to the Committee on Transportation, in concurrence. |
2015-01-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-01-14 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION. |
2015-01-14 | House | Committee on Transportation suggested and ordered printed. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=47&snum=127 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0041&item=1&snum=127 |