ME LD466 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-12 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-12 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, to Evaluate Options for the Recycling of Solar Panels and Wind Turbine Blades
Title
Resolve, to Evaluate Options for the Recycling of Solar Panels and Wind Turbine Blades
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-12 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence. |
2023-06-12 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-06-12 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-274), in concurrence. |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-274) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2023-06-07 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2023-06-06 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-06-06 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-274). |
2023-06-06 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2023-06-06 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2023-06-01 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2023-05-17 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2023-05-17 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. |
2023-02-07 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES in concurrence |
2023-02-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-02-07 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES. |
2023-02-07 | House | Committee on Environment and Natural Resources suggested and ordered printed. |