ME LD463 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-29 - in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Improve the Funding of County Jails

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Improve the Funding of County Jails

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-29 - Senate - Reconsideration - Veto RC #392 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #416 (Y: 122 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-29Senatein concurrence
2017-06-29SenateLD 463 In Senate, June 29, 2017, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 34 IN FAVOR and 0 AGAINST, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN.
2017-06-29HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-06-29HouseROLL CALL NO. 416V 122 having voted in the affirmative and 17 in the negative, with 11 being absent, and 1 excused, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor, since two-thirds of the members of the House so voted.
2017-06-29HouseThis Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?"
2017-06-15SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2017-06-15HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-06-15HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2017-06-13SenateOrdered sent down forthwith.
2017-06-13SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-487), in concurrence.
2017-06-13SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-487) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
2017-06-13SenateREAD ONCE.
2017-06-13SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
2017-06-12HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-06-12HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-487).
2017-06-12HouseUnder suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
2017-06-12HouseCONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
2017-02-07SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY in concurrence
2017-02-07HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-02-07HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY.
2017-02-07HouseCommittee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback