ME LD46 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 28 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Carried over on the Special Appropriations Table to any special or regular sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Resolve, To Establish the Cumberland County Jail Substance Use Disorder Rehabilitation Pilot Project

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Resolve, To Establish the Cumberland County Jail Substance Use Disorder Rehabilitation Pilot Project

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20HouseCarried over on the Special Appropriations Table to any special or regular sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322.
2019-06-20SenateCARRIED OVER on the Special Appropriations Table to any Special or Regular Sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322.
2019-05-30SenateOn motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE, in concurrence.
2019-05-29HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-05-29HouseFINALLY PASSED.
2019-05-28SenateOrdered sent down forthwith.
2019-05-28SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-354), in concurrence.
2019-05-28SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-354) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
2019-05-28SenateREAD ONCE.
2019-05-28SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
2019-05-28HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-05-28HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-354).
2019-05-28HouseUnder suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
2019-05-28HouseCONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
2019-01-09SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES in concurrence
2019-01-09HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-01-09HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.
2019-01-09HouseCommittee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback