ME LD46 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Provide Consistency with Regard to Jury Duty Exemption
Title
An Act To Provide Consistency with Regard to Jury Duty Exemption
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-19 - Senate - Acceptance Of Report RC #346 (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-22 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2017-06-22 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-22 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2017-06-21 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-21 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-46). |
2017-06-21 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2017-06-21 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-46) READ and ADOPTED Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-46) |
2017-06-19 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 346 Yeas 26 - Nays 9 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Subsequently Report ACCEPTED |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2017-06-16 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-12 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-09 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-04-27 | Senate | On motion by Senator KEIM of Oxford Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE of THE REPORT |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Reports READ |
2017-01-11 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-01-11 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY. |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-01-10 | Senate | REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY |
2017-01-10 | Senate | suggested and ordered printed |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Committee on JUDICIARY |