ME LD458 | 2009-2010 | 124th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-06 - (S) FINALLY PASSED in concurrence
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-06 - (S) FINALLY PASSED in concurrence
Summary
Resolve, Directing the Department of Agriculture, Food and Rural Resources To Study Equine Husbandry Practices in the State
Title
Resolve, Directing the Department of Agriculture, Food and Rural Resources To Study Equine Husbandry Practices in the State
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-06 | (S) FINALLY PASSED in concurrence | |
2009-05-05 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-05-05 | (H) FINALLY PASSED. | |
2009-04-30 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-04-30 | (H) The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-70) | |
2009-04-30 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2009-04-30 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative HAYES, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2009-04-29 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | |
2009-04-28 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence | |
2009-04-28 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-70) | |
2009-04-28 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Damon, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2009-04-16 | (S) Assigned for Second Reading next Legislative Day | |
2009-04-16 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (S-70) READ and ADOPTED | |
2009-04-16 | (S) READ ONCE | |
2009-04-16 | (S) Report READ and ACCEPTED | |
2009-02-10 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-02-10 | (H) Resolve REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY. | |
2009-02-10 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence | |
2009-02-10 | (S) On motion by Senator Nutting of Androscoggin REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY | |
2009-02-10 | (S) Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry suggested and ordered printed. |