ME LD456 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Failed on August 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-02 - In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Failed on August 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-02 - In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Increase Access to Vaccinations
Title
An Act To Increase Access to Vaccinations
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Chace [R] | Sen. Shenna Bellows [D] | Rep. James Gillway [R] | Rep. Martin Grohman [D] |
Rep. Richard Malaby [R] | Rep. Tom Winsor [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-31 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #195 (Y: 68 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-02 | Senate | In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD). |
2017-06-15 | Senate | On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT |
2017-06-15 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-15 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2017-06-14 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-14 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-208) as Amended by Senate Amendment "B" (S-263) thereto. |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-208) as Amended by Senate Amendment "B" (S-263) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-208) as Amended by Senate Amendment "B" (S-263) thereto ADOPTED |
2017-06-13 | Senate | On motion by Senator BELLOWS of Kennebec Senate Amendment "B" (S-263) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-208) READ and ADOPTED |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-208) READ |
2017-06-13 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Subsequently The Minority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President ProTem |
2017-06-12 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-09 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-05 | Senate | On further motion by same Senator TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending her motion to ACCEPT the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report, in concurrence |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Senator VOLK of Cumberland moved to ACCEPT the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Reports READ |
2017-05-31 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-31 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-208) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-335) thereto. |
2017-05-31 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2017-05-31 | House | On motion of Representative CHACE of Durham, House Amendment "A" (H-335) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-208) thereto was ADOPTED. |
2017-05-31 | House | On motion of Representative HERBIG of Belfast, the House RECONSIDERED its action whereby Committee Amendment "A" (H-208) was ADOPTED. |
2017-05-31 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-208) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2017-05-31 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2017-05-31 | House | On further motion of same Representative the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2017-05-31 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 195 (Yeas 68 - Nays 74 - Absent 8 - Excused 1) |
2017-05-31 | House | Motion of Representative FECTEAU of Biddeford to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report FAILED. |
2017-05-31 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2017-05-30 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-25 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-24 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-24 | House | Later today assigned. |
2017-05-24 | House | On motion of Representative HERBIG of Belfast, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report. |
2017-05-24 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT in concurrence |
2017-02-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-02-07 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT. |
2017-02-07 | House | Committee on Labor, Commerce, Research and Economic Development suggested and ordered printed. |