ME LD451 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Failed on January 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-26 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Failed on January 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-26 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Remove the Party Designation from Return Envelopes for Absentee Ballots for the General Election
Title
An Act To Remove the Party Designation from Return Envelopes for Absentee Ballots for the General Election
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-26 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2022-01-21 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP |
2022-01-10 | Joint | Voted: ONTP |
2022-01-10 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-07-19 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302. |
2021-06-03 | Joint | Carry Over Approved |
2021-05-28 | Joint | Carry Over Requested |
2021-04-30 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-02-11 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-02-11 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on February 11, 2021. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=451&snum=130 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0327&item=1&snum=130 |