ME LD447 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-29 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-29 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Repeal Outdated Statutory Sections Relating to Regional Ride Share Programs
Title
An Act To Repeal Outdated Statutory Sections Relating to Regional Ride Share Programs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-29 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2015-04-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-04-28 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2015-04-23 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-04-23 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2015-04-23 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2015-04-23 | House | Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative McLEAN of Gorham, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. |
2015-04-16 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2015-04-09 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2015-04-09 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2015-02-24 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-02-24 | House | Bill REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT. |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2015-02-24 | Senate | On motion by Senator Volk of Cumberland REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT |
2015-02-24 | Senate | suggested and ordered printed |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT |