ME LD445 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-14 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Encourage Maine Consumers To Comparison-shop for Certain Health Care Procedures and To Lower Health Care Costs

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Encourage Maine Consumers To Comparison-shop for Certain Health Care Procedures and To Lower Health Care Costs

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-14SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2017-06-13HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-06-13HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2017-06-12HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-06-12HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-236).
2017-06-12HouseUnder suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
2017-06-12HouseCONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
2017-06-12SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
2017-06-12SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-236).
2017-06-12SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (S-236) READ and ADOPTED.
2017-06-12SenateREAD ONCE.
2017-06-12SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED.
2017-02-07HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-02-07HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES.
2017-02-07SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence
2017-02-07SenateREFERENCE to the Committee on INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES
2017-02-07SenateCommittee on INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES suggested and ordered printed

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback