ME LD442 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Clarify Municipal Capacity for Site Location of Development and Encourage Local Development
Title
An Act To Clarify Municipal Capacity for Site Location of Development and Encourage Local Development
Sponsors
Sen. Amy Volk [R] | Sen. Andre Cushing [R] | Sen. Stanley Gerzofsky [D] | Sen. Nathan Libby [D] |
Rep. Rebecca Millett [D] | Rep. Heather Sirocki [R] | Rep. Karen Vachon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-14 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2015-04-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-04-09 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2015-04-07 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-04-07 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2015-04-07 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2015-04-07 | House | Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative McLEAN of Gorham, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. |
2015-04-02 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Assigned for Second Reading next Legislative Day |
2015-03-31 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED |
2015-02-24 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-02-24 | House | Bill REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES. |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2015-02-24 | Senate | On motion by Senator Saviello of Franklin REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES |
2015-02-24 | Senate | suggested and ordered printed |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES |