ME LD441 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Failed on March 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-20 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Failed on March 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-20 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Require Certification under the United States Environmental Protection Agency's Lead Renovation, Repair and Painting Rule
Title
An Act To Require Certification under the United States Environmental Protection Agency's Lead Renovation, Repair and Painting Rule
Sponsors
Sen. Nathan Libby [D] | Rep. Jeffrey Pierce [R] | Sen. Roger Katz [R] | Rep. Heidi Brooks [D] |
Rep. Roger Fuller [D] | Rep. James Handy [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-25 - House - Acc Report 'a' Otp As Amend RC #45 (Y: 77 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Accept Rpt 'b' Ontp RC #86 (Y: 18 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Accept Rpt 'b' Ontp RC #85 (Y: 16 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Accept Rpt 'b' Ontp RC #86 (Y: 18 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Accept Rpt 'b' Ontp RC #85 (Y: 16 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-20 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2017-05-02 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2017-05-02 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-02 | House | The House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of REPORT A Ought to Pass as Amended and PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-38). |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-04-27 | Senate | On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin The Senate INSISTED To Acceptance of Report B Ought Not To Pass In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-04-25 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-04-25 | House | In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. |
2017-04-25 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-38). |
2017-04-25 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2017-04-25 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-38) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2017-04-25 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2017-04-25 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 45 (Yeas 77 - Nays 66 - Absent 7 - Excused 1) |
2017-04-25 | House | On motion of Representative FECTEAU of Biddeford, REPORT A Ought to Pass as Amended was ACCEPTED. |
2017-04-25 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 86 Yeas 18 - Nays 16 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Subsequently, Report B Ought Not To Pass ACCEPTED |
2017-04-20 | Senate | On motion by Senator CUSHING of Penobscot The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby Report B Ought Not To Pass FAILED TO BE ACCEPTED |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2017-04-20 | Senate | On motion by Senator CUSHING of Penobscot Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF EITHER REPORT |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 85 Yeas 16 - Nays 18 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Motion by Senator VOLK of Cumberland to ACCEPT Report B Ought Not To Pass FAILED |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Reports READ |
2017-02-07 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-02-07 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-02-07 | Senate | REFERENCE to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT suggested and ordered printed |