ME LD440 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Conserve the Frances Perkins Homestead National Historic Landmark
Title
An Act To Conserve the Frances Perkins Homestead National Historic Landmark
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-28 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #42 (Y: 81 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #127 (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #127 (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-02 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence |
2021-07-02 | Senate | On Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2021-05-19 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-05-19 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2021-04-28 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-04-28 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-55). |
2021-04-28 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2021-04-28 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-55) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2021-04-28 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2021-04-28 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 42 (Yeas 81 - Nays 49 - Absent 21 - Excused 0) |
2021-04-28 | House | On motion of Representative BRENNAN of Portland, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-04-28 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-55) |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-55) READ and ADOPTED |
2021-04-28 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 127 Yeas 24 - Nays 11 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2021-04-28 | Senate | On motion by Senator RAFFERTY of York The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Reports READ |
2021-04-22 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2021-03-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-15 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-03-15 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on February 11, 2021 and REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |