ME LD440 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Continue the Doctors for Maine's Future Scholarship Program
Title
An Act To Continue the Doctors for Maine's Future Scholarship Program
Sponsors
Sen. Linda Sanborn [D] | Sen. Geoffrey Gratwick [D] | Sen. Erin Herbig [D] | Sen. Teresa Pierce [D] |
Sen. Heather Sanborn [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-20 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-06-19 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-19 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-06-19 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-19 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-61) and Senate Amendment "A" (S-326). |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2019-06-19 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-61) AND Senate Amendment "A" (S-326) In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2019-06-19 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-326) READ and ADOPTED |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules On motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED |
2019-06-19 | Senate | On Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-05-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-14 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-05-08 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-08 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-61). |
2019-05-08 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2019-05-08 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-61) |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-61) READ and ADOPTED |
2019-05-07 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Subsequently Report Accepted |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-04-25 | Senate | On motion by Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE of the Report |
2019-01-29 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-01-29 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INNOVATION, DEVELOPMENT, ECONOMIC ADVANCEMENT AND BUSINESS. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Committee on INNOVATION, DEVELOPMENT, ECONOMIC ADVANCEMENT AND BUSINESS suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on INNOVATION, DEVELOPMENT, ECONOMIC ADVANCEMENT AND BUSINESS Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |