ME LD435 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Failed on April 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-19 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Failed on April 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-19 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Study the Feasibility and Cost of Providing Passenger Rail Service to the City of Bangor
Title
Resolve, To Study the Feasibility and Cost of Providing Passenger Rail Service to the City of Bangor
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-19 - Senate - Accept Maj Ontp Rpt RC #79 (Y: 16 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #30 (Y: 104 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #30 (Y: 104 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-19 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 79 Yeas 16 - Nays 15 - Excused 4 - Absent 0 PREVAILED |
2017-04-19 | Senate | On motion by Senator COLLINS of York the The Majority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-04-18 | Senate | On motion by Senator COLLINS of York Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF EITHER REPORT |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Reports READ |
2017-04-13 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-04-13 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 30 (Yeas 104 - Nays 42 - Absent 4 - Excused 1) |
2017-04-13 | House | On motion of Representative McLEAN of Gorham, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2017-04-13 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION in concurrence |
2017-02-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-02-07 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION. |
2017-02-07 | House | Committee on Transportation suggested and ordered printed. |