ME LD433 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Failed on May 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-25 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Failed on May 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-25 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, Directing the Commissioner of Corrections and the Commissioner of Health and Human Services to Establish a Working Group on the Relocation of the Division of Juvenile Services
Title
Resolve, Directing the Commissioner of Corrections and the Commissioner of Health and Human Services to Establish a Working Group on the Relocation of the Division of Juvenile Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-25 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2023-05-23 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP |
2023-05-18 | Joint | Voted: ONTP |
2023-05-18 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. |
2023-02-02 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY in concurrence |
2023-02-02 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-02-02 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY. |
2023-02-02 | House | Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety suggested and ordered printed. |