ME LD433 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 106-5-4)
Status: Enrolled on May 23 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-08-26 - Unfinished Business
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

RESOLUTION, Proposing an Amendment to the Constitution of Maine To Explicitly Prohibit Discrimination Based on the Sex of an Individual

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

RESOLUTION, Proposing an Amendment to the Constitution of Maine To Explicitly Prohibit Discrimination Based on the Sex of an Individual

Sponsors

Rep. Lois Galgay Reckitt [D]Rep. Kent Ackley [I]Rep. Robert Alley [D]Rep. Betty Austin [D]
Rep. Christopher Babbidge [D]Rep. Shawn Babine [D]Rep. Donna Bailey [D]Rep. Pinny Beebe-Center [D]
Sen. Shenna Bellows [D]Rep. Seth Berry [D]Rep. Lydia Blume [D]Sen. Catherine Breen [D]
Rep. Michael Brennan [D]Rep. Heidi Brooks [D]Rep. Mark Bryant [D]Rep. Christopher Caiazzo [D]
Rep. Barbara Cardone [D]Rep. Anne Carney [D]Sen. Michael Carpenter [D]Sen. Everett Carson [D]
Sen. Justin Chenette [D]Sen. Benjamin Chipman [D]Sen. Ned Claxton [D]Rep. Kristen Cloutier [D]
Rep. Benjamin Collings [D]Rep. Janice Cooper [D]Rep. Patrick Corey [R]Rep. Margaret Craven [D]
Rep. Edward Crockett [D]Rep. Scott Cuddy [D]Rep. Matthea Larsen Daughtry [D]Rep. Jennifer DeChant [D]
Rep. Diane Denk [D]Rep. Dale Denno [D]Sen. Susan Deschambault [D]Rep. Michael Devin [D]
Sen. William Diamond [D]Rep. Janice Dodge [D]Rep. Donna Doore [D]Rep. Victoria Doudera [D]
Sen. Dana Dow [R]Rep. Michelle Dunphy [D]Rep. Jeffrey Evangelos [I]Rep. Richard Farnsworth [D]
Rep. Jessica Fay [D]Rep. Ryan Fecteau [D]Sen. Robert Foley [R]Rep. Victoria Foley [D]
Rep. Andrew Gattine [D]Rep. Sara Gideon [D]Rep. Lori Gramlich [D]Sen. Geoffrey Gratwick [D]
Rep. Nicole Grohoski [D]Rep. James Handy [D]Rep. Thomas Harnett [D]Rep. Allison Hepler [D]
Sen. Erin Herbig [D]Rep. Craig Hickman [D]Rep. Daniel Hobbs [D]Rep. Patricia Hymanson [D]
Rep. Henry Ingwersen [D]Sen. Troy Jackson [D]Rep. Erik Jorgensen [D]Rep. Christopher Kessler [D]
Rep. Victoria Kornfield [D]Rep. Scott Landry [D]Sen. Mark Lawrence [D]Sen. Nathan Libby [D]
Sen. Louis Luchini [D]Rep. Colleen Madigan [D]Rep. John Martin [D]Rep. Roland Martin [D]
Rep. Anne-Marie Mastraccio [D]Rep. Ann Matlack [D]Rep. Chloe Maxmin [D]Rep. David McCrea [D]
Rep. Joyce McCreight [D]Rep. Genevieve McDonald [D]Rep. Andrew McLean [D]Rep. Gina Melaragno [D]
Rep. Michele Meyer [D]Sen. Rebecca Millett [D]Sen. David Miramant [D]Rep. Matthew Moonen [D]
Sen. Marianne Moore [R]Rep. Victoria Morales [D]Rep. Catherine Nadeau [D]Rep. Margaret O'Neil [D]
Rep. Sarah Pebworth [D]Rep. Ann Peoples [D]Rep. Anne Perry [D]Rep. Teresa Pierce [D]
Rep. William Pluecker [I]Rep. Christina Riley [D]Rep. Walter Riseman [I]Rep. Deane Rykerson [D]
Sen. Heather Sanborn [D]Sen. Linda Sanborn [D]Rep. John Schneck [D]Rep. Braden Sharpe [D]
Rep. Bettyann Sheats [D]Rep. Thomas Skolfield [R]Rep. Stephen Stanley [D]Rep. Holly Stover [D]
Rep. Michael Sylvester [D]Rep. Rachel Talbot Ross [D]Rep. Denise Tepler [D]Rep. Maureen Terry [D]
Rep. Ryan Tipping-Spitz [D]Rep. Ralph Tucker [D]Rep. Arthur Verow [D]Sen. Eloise Vitelli [D]
Rep. Charlotte Warren [D]Rep. Bruce White [D]Rep. Stanley Zeigler [D]

Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #132 (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #92 (Y: 87 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-26HouseUnfinished Business
2019-06-20SenateCARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322.
2019-06-20HouseCarried over to any special or regular sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322.
2019-06-18HouseUnfinished Business
2019-06-17HouseUnfinished Business
2019-06-14HouseUnfinished Business
2019-06-13HouseUnfinished Business
2019-06-12HouseUnfinished Business
2019-06-11HouseUnfinished Business
2019-06-10HouseUnfinished Business
2019-06-07HouseUnfinished Business
2019-06-06HouseUnfinished Business
2019-06-05HouseUnfinished Business
2019-06-04HouseUnfinished Business
2019-06-03HouseUnfinished Business
2019-05-30HouseUnfinished Business
2019-05-29HouseUnfinished Business
2019-05-28HouseUnfinished Business
2019-05-28HouseLater today assigned.
2019-05-28HouseOn motion of Representative FECTEAU of Biddeford, TABLED pending FINAL PASSAGE.
2019-05-23SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-230) in concurrence
2019-05-23SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-230) READ and ADOPTED
2019-05-23SenateREAD ONCE
2019-05-23SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 132 Yeas 26 - Nays 9 - Excused 0 - Absent 0
2019-05-23SenateSubsequently The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED
2019-05-23SenateTaken from the table by the President
2019-05-21SenateUnfinished Business
2019-05-16SenateUnfinished Business
2019-05-16SenateOn motion by Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending motion by Senator CARPENTER of Aroostook to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report in Concurrence.
2019-05-16SenateSenator CARPENTER of Aroostook moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report in Concurrence.
2019-05-16SenateReports READ
2019-05-14HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-05-14HouseThe RESOLUTION was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-230).
2019-05-14HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the RESOLUTION was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2019-05-14HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (H-230) was READ and ADOPTED.
2019-05-14HouseThe RESOLUTION was READ ONCE.
2019-05-14HouseROLL CALL NO. 92 (Yeas 87 - Nays 54 - Absent 7 - Excused 2 Vacant 1)
2019-05-14HouseOn motion of Representative BAILEY of Saco, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
2019-05-14HouseReports READ.
2019-01-29SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY in concurrence
2019-01-29HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-01-29HouseThe RESOLUTION was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY.
2019-01-29HouseCommittee on Judiciary suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback