ME LD433 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-11 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-11 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Exempt from Income Tax the Income of Nonresidents Working in Maine Pursuant to an Interlocal Agreement
Title
An Act To Exempt from Income Tax the Income of Nonresidents Working in Maine Pursuant to an Interlocal Agreement
Sponsors
Rep. Roberta Beavers [D] | Rep. Devin Beliveau [D] | Rep. Kathleen Chase [R] | Rep. Mark Eves [D] |
Sen. Dawn Hill [D] | Rep. Windol Weaver [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-11 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence | |
2011-05-10 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-05-10 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2011-05-05 | (S) On motion by Senator COURTNEY of York The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED To PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED Committee Amendment "A" (S-20) As Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-131) thereto | |
2011-05-03 | (H) ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-05-03 | (H) In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. | |
2011-05-03 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-20) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-131) thereto. | |
2011-05-03 | (H) READ the Second Time. | |
2011-05-03 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative RICHARDSON of Carmel, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2011-04-28 | (H) TOMORROW ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING. | |
2011-04-28 | (H) Committee Amendment "A" (S-20) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-131) thereto was ADOPTED. | |
2011-04-28 | (H) On motion of Representative KNIGHT of Livermore Falls House Amendment "A" (H-131) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-20) was READ and ADOPTED. | |
2011-04-28 | (H) Committee Amendment "A" (S-20) was READ. | |
2011-04-28 | (H) The Bill was READ ONCE. | |
2011-04-28 | (H) Subsequently, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. | |
2011-04-28 | (H) Speaker laid before the House | |
2011-04-27 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-04-26 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-04-14 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-04-13 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-04-12 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-04-07 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-04-07 | (H) Later today assigned. | |
2011-04-07 | (H) On further motion of the same Representative TABLED pending his motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. | |
2011-04-07 | (H) Representative KNIGHT of Livermore Falls moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. | |
2011-04-07 | (H) Reports READ. | |
2011-04-06 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence | |
2011-04-06 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME And PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-20) (Remarks Made) Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 27 28 Yeas - 7 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent | |
2011-04-06 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Rosen, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2011-04-05 | (S) ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY | |
2011-04-05 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (S-20) READ and ADOPTED. | |
2011-04-05 | (S) READ ONCE | |
2011-04-05 | (S) Taken from the table by the President On motion by Senator TRAHAN of Lincoln Majority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-20) Report ACCEPTED. | |
2011-03-31 | (S) On motion by Senator COURTNEY of York Tabled Later Today Assigned pending Motion by Senator TRAHAN of Lincoln to ACCEPT MAJORITY OUGHT TO PASS AS AMENDED Report Unfinished Business | |
2011-03-31 | (S) Reports READ Senator TRAHAN of Lincoln moved to Accept the Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report | |
2011-02-15 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-02-15 | (H) Bill REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION. | |
2011-02-10 | (S) On motion by Senator THOMAS of Somerset REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence | |
2011-02-10 | (S) suggested and ordered printed | |
2011-02-10 | (S) Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT |