ME LD422 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Enact the Maine Uniform Trust Decanting Act
Title
An Act To Enact the Maine Uniform Trust Decanting Act
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-10 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-09 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-445), in concurrence. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-445) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-08 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-08 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-445). |
2021-06-08 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2021-06-08 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2021-06-07 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-18 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2021-03-18 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-03-04 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2021-02-08 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed. |
2021-02-08 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on February 8, 2021. |
2021-02-08 | House | Reported by Representative HARNETT for the Probate and Trust Law Advisory Commission pursuant to the Maine Revised Statutes, Title 18-C, section 1-803, subsection 2. |