ME LD422 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-10 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-10 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Improve Access to Treatments for Lyme Disease
Title
An Act To Improve Access to Treatments for Lyme Disease
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-08 - Senate - Accept Min Otp-a Rpt RC #159 (Y: 10 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-05-29 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #115 (Y: 106 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-05-29 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #115 (Y: 106 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-10 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2015-06-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-10 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2015-06-08 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2015-06-08 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-216) , in CONCURRENCE. |
2015-06-08 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-216) READ and ADOPTED , in CONCURRENCE. |
2015-06-08 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2015-06-08 | Senate | Subsequently, Majority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-216) Report ACCEPTED , in concurrence. |
2015-06-08 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 159 10 Yeas - 25 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent |
2015-06-08 | Senate | On motion by Senator VOLK of Cumberland the Minority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "B" (H-217) report, in NON-CONCURRENCE. FAILED |
2015-06-08 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President ProTem |
2015-06-05 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-06-01 | Senate | On motion by Senator VOLK of Cumberland Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF EITHER REPORT |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Reports READ |
2015-05-29 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-05-29 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-216). |
2015-05-29 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2015-05-29 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-216) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2015-05-29 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2015-05-29 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 115 (Yeas 106 - Nays 34 - Absent 11 - Excused 0) |
2015-05-29 | House | On motion of Representative HERBIG of Belfast, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2015-05-29 | House | Reports READ. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | On motion by Senator Volk of Cumberland, REFERRED to the Committee on Labor, Commerce, Research and Economic Development, in concurrence. |
2015-02-12 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-02-12 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT. |
2015-02-12 | House | Committee on Labor, Commerce, Research and Economic Development suggested and ordered printed. |