ME LD42 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-01 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-01 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Require the Department of Inland Fisheries and Wildlife To Conduct a Study on the Use of Rubber Lures and Nondegradable Fishing Hooks and Lures
Title
Resolve, To Require the Department of Inland Fisheries and Wildlife To Conduct a Study on the Use of Rubber Lures and Nondegradable Fishing Hooks and Lures
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Davis [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-01 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence. |
2013-04-30 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-04-30 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-47), in concurrence. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Cleveland, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-47) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | On motion by Senator DUTREMBLE of York the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Reports READ. |
2013-04-23 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-04-23 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-47). |
2013-04-23 | House | READ the Second Time. |
2013-04-23 | House | Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative McLEAN of Gorham, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. |
2013-04-10 | House | TOMORROW ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING. |
2013-04-10 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-47) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2013-04-10 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2013-04-10 | House | On motion of Representative SHAW of Standish, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2013-04-10 | House | Reports READ. |
2013-01-17 | Senate | On motion by Senator Dutremble of York, REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE and ordered printed, in concurrence. |
2013-01-17 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-01-17 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE. |
2013-01-17 | House | Committee on Inland Fisheries and Wildlife suggested and ordered printed. |