ME LD412 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Restore System Administration Allocations in Maine School Administrative Units to the Level Prescribed for Fiscal Year 2017-18
Title
An Act To Restore System Administration Allocations in Maine School Administrative Units to the Level Prescribed for Fiscal Year 2017-18
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #122 (Y: 95 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-30 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-05-29 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-29 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-310) in concurrence |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-310) READ and ADOPTED |
2019-05-28 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2019-05-28 | Senate | On motion by Senator MILLETT of Cumberland the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Reports Read |
2019-05-23 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-23 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-310). |
2019-05-23 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2019-05-23 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-310) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2019-05-23 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2019-05-23 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 122 (Yeas 95 - Nays 41 - Absent 12 - Excused 2 Vacant 1) |
2019-05-23 | House | On motion of Representative KORNFIELD of Bangor, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2019-05-23 | House | Reports READ. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS in concurrence |
2019-01-29 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-01-29 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS. |
2019-01-29 | House | Committee on Education and Cultural Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |