ME LD412 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on June 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-16 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on June 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-16 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Direct the Development of After-school Programs
Title
Resolve, To Direct the Development of After-school Programs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-16 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #333 (Y: 79 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Veto Override (2/3) RC #309 (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Veto Override (2/3) RC #309 (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-16 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2017-06-16 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-16 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 333V 79 having voted in the affirmative and 62 in the negative, with 10 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill not become a law and the veto was sustained. |
2017-06-16 | House | This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Subsequently LD 412 In Senate, June 15, 2017, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 31 IN FAVOR and 4 AGAINST, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN. |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President ProTem |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-14 | Senate | On motion by Senator COLLINS of York Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending CONSIDERATION |
2017-05-31 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence. |
2017-05-30 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-30 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2017-05-25 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-25 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-132). |
2017-05-25 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2017-05-25 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-132) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2017-05-25 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2017-05-25 | House | On motion of Representative KORNFIELD of Bangor, the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2017-05-25 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME AND PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-132) |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-132) READ and ADOPTED |
2017-05-24 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2017-05-24 | Senate | On motion by Senator LANGLEY of Hancock the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Reports Read |
2017-02-07 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-02-07 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |