ME LD411 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-14 - (S) Under suspension of the Rules FINALLY PASSED - Emergency 2/3 Elected Required in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Resolve, Regarding Legislative Review of Portions of Chapter 305: Permit by Rule Standards, Section 16, Activities in Coastal Dunes, a Major Substantive Rule of the Department of Environmental Protection

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Resolve, Regarding Legislative Review of Portions of Chapter 305: Permit by Rule Standards, Section 16, Activities in Coastal Dunes, a Major Substantive Rule of the Department of Environmental Protection

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2011-04-14 (S) Under suspension of the Rules FINALLY PASSED - Emergency 2/3 Elected Required in concurrence
2011-04-14 (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2011-04-14 (H) FINALLY PASSED.
2011-04-12 (S) READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-61) in concurrence
2011-04-12 (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Rosen, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED.
2011-04-07 (S) ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY.
2011-04-07 (S) Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence READ ONCE Committee Amendment "A" (H-61) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence
2011-04-06 (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2011-04-06 (H) The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-61)
2011-04-06 (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
2011-04-06 (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative RICHARDSON of Carmel, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted.
2011-04-05 (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
2011-02-08 (S) Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence On motion by Senator Saviello of Franklin REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218 in concurrence
2011-02-08 (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2011-02-08 (H) The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218.
2011-02-08 (H) Report was READ and ACCEPTED.
2011-02-08 (H) Representative HAMPER for the Department of Environmental Protection pursuant to the Maine Revised Statutes, Title 5, section 8072, reports that the Resolve be REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES and printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback