ME LD410 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-25 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-25 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Except from the Freedom of Access Act Certain Information in the Possession of the Maine Public Employees Retirement System
Title
An Act To Except from the Freedom of Access Act Certain Information in the Possession of the Maine Public Employees Retirement System
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-25 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2017-04-20 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-04-20 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2017-04-18 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-04-18 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2017-04-18 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2017-04-18 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Assigned for SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED |
2017-02-07 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-02-07 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-02-07 | Senate | REFERENCE to the Committee on JUDICIARY |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Committee on JUDICIARY suggested and ordered printed |