ME LD403 | 2009-2010 | 124th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Failed on January 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-14 - (S) Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.6 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD).
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Failed on January 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-14 - (S) Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.6 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD).
Summary
An Act To Increase the Minimum Wage
Title
An Act To Increase the Minimum Wage
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-14 | (S) Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.6 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD). | |
2009-06-15 | (S) CARRIED OVER TO ANY SPECIAL OR REGULAR SESSION OF THE 124th LEGISLATURE PURSUANT TO JOINT ORDER HP 1053, IN CONCURRENCE | |
2009-06-13 | (H) Carried over to any special or regular session of the 124th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1053. | |
2009-02-10 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules On motion by Senator Jackson of Aroostook, REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR and ordered printed, in concurrence. | |
2009-02-10 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-02-10 | (H) The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR. | |
2009-02-10 | (H) Committee on Labor suggested and ordered printed. |