ME LD400 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Failed on May 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-24 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Failed on May 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-24 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Regarding the Construction or Placement of Decks within the Shoreland Zone
Title
An Act Regarding the Construction or Placement of Decks within the Shoreland Zone
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-24 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2017-05-24 | Senate | On motion by Senator SAVIELLO of Franklin The Senate INSISTED To Acceptance of The Minority Ought to Pass As Amended Report AND PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-165) In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-05-23 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-23 | House | The House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME AND PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-165) In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-165) READ and ADOPTED |
2017-05-18 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2017-05-18 | Senate | On motion by Senator SAVIELLO of Franklin the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Reports Read |
2017-05-17 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-17 | House | On motion of Representative TUCKER of Brunswick, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2017-05-17 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES in concurrence |
2017-02-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-02-07 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES. |
2017-02-07 | House | Committee on Environment and Natural Resources suggested and ordered printed. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=400&snum=128 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0291&item=1&snum=128 |