ME LD40 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-11 - FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-11 - FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, Regarding Legislative Review of Portions of Chapter 305: Rules and Regulations Pertaining to Traffic Movement Permits, a Major Substantive Rule of the Department of Transportation
Title
Resolve, Regarding Legislative Review of Portions of Chapter 305: Rules and Regulations Pertaining to Traffic Movement Permits, a Major Substantive Rule of the Department of Transportation
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-11 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2021-03-11 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-03-11 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2021-03-11 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2021-03-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-03-10 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2021-03-10 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2021-03-10 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2021-03-01 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP |
2021-02-04 | Joint | Voted: OTP |
2021-02-04 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-01-11 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed. |
2021-01-11 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on January 11, 2021. |
2021-01-11 | House | Reported by Representative MARTIN for the Department of Transportation pursuant to the Maine Revised Statutes, Title 5, section 8072. |