ME LD40 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on March 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-12 - Placed in the Legislative Files (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on March 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-12 - Placed in the Legislative Files (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Protect a Private Memorial Placed in a Public Right-of-way
Title
An Act To Protect a Private Memorial Placed in a Public Right-of-way
Sponsors
Rep. Kathleen Chase [R] | Sen. Andre Cushing [R] | Sen. Patrick Flood [R] | Rep. Paul Bennett [R] |
Rep. Lance Harvell [R] | Rep. Wayne Parry [R] | Rep. Deborah Sanderson [R] | Rep. Heather Sirocki [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-07 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #6 (Y: 91 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-12 | Senate | Placed in the Legislative Files (DEAD). |
2013-03-12 | Senate | On motion by Senator GERZOFSKY of Cumberland the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Reports READ. |
2013-03-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-03-07 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 6 (Yeas 91 - Nays 51 - Absent 9 - Excused 0) |
2013-03-07 | House | On motion of Representative DION of Portland, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2013-03-07 | House | Reports READ. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | On motion by Senator GERZOFSKY of Cumberland REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY, in concurrence. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | TAKEN from the Table by the President. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | (Unfinished Business) |
2013-01-17 | Senate | (Unfinished Business) |
2013-01-17 | Senate | On motion by Senator GERZOFSKY of Cumberland TABLED until Later in Today's Session, pending REFERENCE, in concurrence. |
2013-01-17 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-01-17 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY. |
2013-01-17 | House | Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety suggested and ordered printed. |