ME LD40 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Failed on May 31 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-31 - (H) Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Failed on May 31 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-31 - (H) Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
RESOLUTION, Proposing an Amendment to the Constitution of Maine To Reduce the Size of the House of Representatives
Title
RESOLUTION, Proposing an Amendment to the Constitution of Maine To Reduce the Size of the House of Representatives
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-31 | (H) Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) | |
2011-05-31 | (H) ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-05-31 | (H) The House INSISTED to ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report. | |
2011-05-26 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED As Amended By Committee Amendment "A" (H-198) AND Senate Amendment "C" (S-169) In NON-CONCURRENCE Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence | |
2011-05-26 | (S) Taken from the table by the President On motion by Senator DILL of Cumberland Senate Amendment "C" (S-169) READ (Remarks Made) ADOPTED | |
2011-05-25 | (S) On motion by Senator COURTNEY of York Tabled Later Today Assigned pending PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-198) In NON-CONCURRENCE Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-25 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Rosen, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2011-05-24 | (S) ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. | |
2011-05-24 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (H-198) READ and ADOPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE | |
2011-05-24 | (S) read once | |
2011-05-24 | (S) Reports READ Senator THOMAS of Somerset moved to accept the majority ought not to pass report in concurrence (Remarks Made) Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 97 13 Yeas - 21 Nays- 1 Excused - 0 Absent FAILED Subsequently minority ought to pass as amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-198) READ and accepted | |
2011-05-23 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-05-23 | (H) ROLL CALL NO. 72 (Yeas 80 - Nays 62 - Absent 8 - Excused 0) (Vacancy 1) | |
2011-05-23 | (H) Subsequently, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. | |
2011-05-23 | (H) Speaker laid before the House | |
2011-05-19 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-18 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-17 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-16 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-12 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-11 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-11 | (H) Later today assigned. (Roll Call Ordered) | |
2011-05-11 | (H) On motion of Representative CUSHING of Hampden TABLED pending the motion of Representative COTTA of China to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report. | |
2011-05-11 | (H) Representative COTTA of China moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report. | |
2011-05-11 | (H) Reports READ. | |
2011-01-12 | (S) On motion by Senator Thomas of Somerset, REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT and ordered printed, in concurrence. | |
2011-01-11 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-01-11 | (H) The RESOLUTION was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT. | |
2011-01-11 | (H) Committee on State and Local Government suggested and ordered printed. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.mainelegislature.org/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=40&snum=125 |
Text | https://www.mainelegislature.org/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0033&item=1&snum=125 |