ME LD4 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on April 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - LD 4 In Senate, June 16, 2015, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 28 In Favor and 7 Against , accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on April 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - LD 4 In Senate, June 16, 2015, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 28 In Favor and 7 Against , accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Promote Industrial Hemp
Title
An Act To Promote Industrial Hemp
Sponsors
Rep. Deborah Sanderson [R] | Sen. James Hamper [R] | Rep. Adam Goode [D] | Rep. Beth O'Connor [R] |
Rep. Wayne Parry [R] | Sen. Matthew Pouliot [R] | Rep. Michael Shaw [D] | Sen. Jeffrey Timberlake [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-16 - Senate - Veto Override (2/3) RC #257 (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #63 (Y: 135 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #63 (Y: 135 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-16 | Senate | LD 4 In Senate, June 16, 2015, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 28 In Favor and 7 Against , accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN. |
2015-06-16 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President ProTem |
2015-06-15 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-06-12 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-06-08 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-06-05 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-05-29 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-05-13 | Senate | On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending CONSIDERATION |
2015-05-12 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-05-12 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 63V 135 having voted in the affirmative and 6 in the negative, with 10 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor, since two-thirds of the members of the House so voted. |
2015-05-12 | House | This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" |
2015-04-28 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2015-04-23 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-04-23 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-41), in concurrence. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED , in concurrence. READ ONCE Committee Amendment "A" (H-41) READ and ADOPTED , in concurrence. ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2015-04-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-04-14 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-41). |
2015-04-14 | House | READ the Second Time. |
2015-04-14 | House | Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative McLEAN of Gorham, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. |
2015-04-09 | House | TOMORROW ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING. |
2015-04-09 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-41) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2015-04-09 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2015-04-09 | House | Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2015-04-09 | House | On OBJECTION of Representative FREDETTE of Newport REMOVED. |
2015-04-09 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2015-04-09 | House | Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative McLEAN of Gorham, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. |
2015-04-07 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2015-01-08 | Senate | On motion by Senator Edgecomb of Aroostook, REFERRED to the Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry, in concurrence. |
2015-01-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-01-07 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY. |
2015-01-07 | House | Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry suggested and ordered printed. |