ME LD396 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Failed on April 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-04 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Failed on April 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-04 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Appropriate Sufficient Funds for Indigent Legal Services
Title
An Act To Appropriate Sufficient Funds for Indigent Legal Services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-16 - House - Enactment - Emer RC #93 (Y: 123 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-04 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2013-07-10 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 126th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1145. |
2013-07-09 | House | Carried over to any special and/or regular session of the 126th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1145. |
2013-06-27 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-27 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to COMMITTING the Bill and accompanying papers to the Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator COMMITTED to the Committee on Appropriations and Financial Affairs, , in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | TAKEN from the Table by Senator HILL of York. |
2013-05-21 | Senate | On motion by Senator CAIN of Penobscot, PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE, pending ENACTMENT, in concurrence. |
2013-05-16 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-05-16 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 93 (Yeas 123 - Nays 21 - Absent 7 - Excused 0) |
2013-05-16 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House being necessary, a total was taken. |
2013-05-16 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2013-05-14 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-123), in concurrence. |
2013-05-14 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Cleveland, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2013-05-09 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-123) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2013-05-09 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2013-05-08 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-05-08 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-123). |
2013-05-08 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2013-05-08 | House | Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative McLEAN of Gorham, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. |
2013-05-07 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2013-02-14 | Senate | On motion by Senator Valentino of York, REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY, in concurrence. |
2013-02-12 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-02-12 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY. |
2013-02-12 | House | Committee on Judiciary suggested and ordered printed. |