ME LD393 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-19 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-19 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Clarify That the Department of Transportation Is Exempt from Property Assessment Liabilities When Acquiring Property by Condemnation
Title
An Act To Clarify That the Department of Transportation Is Exempt from Property Assessment Liabilities When Acquiring Property by Condemnation
Sponsors
Rep. James Gillway [R] | Sen. Ronald Collins [R] | Sen. Kimberley Rosen [R] | Rep. Mark Bryant [D] |
Rep. Gay Grant [D] | Rep. Wayne Parry [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-19 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2017-04-18 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-04-18 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-23), in concurrence. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-23) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED |
2017-04-06 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-04-06 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-23). |
2017-04-06 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2017-04-06 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2017-02-07 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION in concurrence |
2017-02-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-02-07 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION. |
2017-02-07 | House | Committee on Transportation suggested and ordered printed. |