ME LD39 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-28 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-28 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Remove the Plastic Bag Ban
Title
An Act To Remove the Plastic Bag Ban
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-28 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #43 (Y: 81 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Accept Maj Ontp Rpt RC #129 (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Accept Maj Ontp Rpt RC #129 (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-28 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2021-04-28 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-04-28 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 43 (Yeas 81 - Nays 49 - Absent 21 - Excused 0) |
2021-04-28 | House | On motion of Representative TUCKER of Brunswick, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-04-28 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 129 Yeas 24 - Nays 11 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2021-04-28 | Senate | On motion by Senator BRENNER of Cumberland The Majority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Reports READ |
2021-03-30 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP/OTP-AM |
2021-03-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-03 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-03-03 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on January 11, 2021 and REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |