ME LD39 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Designate a Bridge in Waterville as the Specialist Wade A. Slack Memorial Bridge
Title
Resolve, To Designate a Bridge in Waterville as the Specialist Wade A. Slack Memorial Bridge
Sponsors
Rep. Colleen Madigan [D] | Rep. Scott Cyrway [R] | Rep. Catherine Nadeau [D] | Rep. Michael Perkins [R] |
Rep. Bruce White [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-12 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence. |
2019-03-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-03-07 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME AND PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED in concurrence |
2019-02-28 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2019-02-26 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-02-26 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2019-02-26 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2019-02-26 | House | Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary. Report Accepted. |
2019-02-21 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2019-01-09 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION in concurrence |
2019-01-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-01-09 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION. |
2019-01-09 | House | Committee on Transportation suggested and ordered printed. |