ME LD384 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Clarify Reimbursement for Parent-only Programs under the MaineCare Program
Title
Resolve, To Clarify Reimbursement for Parent-only Programs under the MaineCare Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-29 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence. |
2018-03-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-03-28 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2018-03-27 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-03-27 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-397). |
2018-03-27 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2018-03-27 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-397). |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-397) READ and ADOPTED. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2017-08-02 | House | Carried over to any special or regular session, or both, of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138. |
2017-08-02 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138. |
2017-02-02 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-02-02 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-02-02 | Senate | REFERENCE to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES suggested and ordered printed |