ME LD381 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Failed on June 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-20 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Failed on June 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-20 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Allow Delivery Vehicles To Display Lighted Advertising Signs
Title
An Act To Allow Delivery Vehicles To Display Lighted Advertising Signs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-15 - Senate - Recede And Concur RC #314 (Y: 17 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-06-12 - Senate - Accept Maj Ontp Rpt RC #278 (Y: 10 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-06-12 - Senate - Accept Maj Ontp Rpt RC #278 (Y: 10 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-20 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2017-06-20 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-20 | House | The House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-06-19 | Senate | On motion by Senator MILLETT of Cumberland The Senate INSISTED To ACCEPTANCE of The Minority Ought to Pass As Amended Report AND PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-238) and ASK for a COMMITTEE OF CONFERENCE |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2017-06-16 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-16 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending INSIST |
2017-06-16 | Senate | On motion by Senator CUSHING of Penobscot RECONSIDERED whereby the Senate INSISTED to The Minority Ought to Pass As Amended Report AND PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-238) |
2017-06-15 | Senate | HELD at the Request of Senator CUSHING of Penobscot. |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Subsequently The Senate INSISTED The Minority Ought to Pass As Amended Report AND PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-238) |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Roll Call Number 314 Yeas 17 - Nays 18 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Subsequently RECEDE and CONCUR FAILED |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President ProTem |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-14 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending To RECEDE and CONCUR Roll Call Ordered |
2017-06-14 | Senate | On motion by Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin RECONSIDERED whereby The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED |
2017-06-14 | Senate | On motion by Senator COLLINS of York The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED With The Majority Ought Not To Pass Report |
2017-06-12 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-12 | House | In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. |
2017-06-12 | House | On motion of Representative McLEAN of Gorham, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2017-06-12 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-06-12 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-06-12 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-238) |
2017-06-12 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-238) READ and ADOPTED |
2017-06-12 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2017-06-12 | Senate | Subsequently The Minority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2017-06-12 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 278 Yeas 10 - Nays 23 - Excused 2 - Absent 0 |
2017-06-12 | Senate | Motion by Senator COLLINS of York to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report FAILED |
2017-06-12 | Senate | Reports Read |
2017-02-02 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-02-02 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-02-02 | Senate | REFERENCE to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Committee on TRANSPORTATION suggested and ordered printed |