ME LD38 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Failed on August 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-02 - In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Failed on August 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-02 - In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Strengthen the Maine Children's Growth Council
Title
An Act To Strengthen the Maine Children's Growth Council
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-17 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #109 (Y: 77 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Accept Min Otp-a Rpt "b" RC #138 (Y: 16 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Accept Min Otp-a Rpt "b" RC #138 (Y: 16 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-02 | Senate | In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD). |
2017-05-24 | Senate | On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT |
2017-05-23 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-23 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2017-05-17 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-17 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-64). |
2017-05-17 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2017-05-17 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-64) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2017-05-17 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2017-05-17 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 109 (Yeas 77 - Nays 67 - Absent 5 - Excused 2) |
2017-05-17 | House | On motion of Representative HYMANSON of York, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2017-05-17 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-64) |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-64) READ and ADOPTED |
2017-05-16 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Subsequently, The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 138 Yeas 16 - Nays 19 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Motion by Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin to ACCEPT The Minority Ought to Pass As Amended Report FAILED |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-04 | Senate | On further motion by same Senator TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending his motion to ACCEPT the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report, by Committee Amendment "B" (S-65) |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin moved to ACCEPT the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Reports READ |
2017-01-31 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-01-31 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-01-26 | Senate | On motion by Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-01-10 | Senate | On motion by Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending REFERENCE |