ME LD38 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Vetoed on May 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-01 - (Placed in the Legislative Files. DEAD.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-01 - (Placed in the Legislative Files. DEAD.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, Regarding Legislative Review of Chapter 201: Provider of Last Resort Service Quality, a Major Substantive Rule of the Public Utilities Commission
Title
Resolve, Regarding Legislative Review of Chapter 201: Provider of Last Resort Service Quality, a Major Substantive Rule of the Public Utilities Commission
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2014-05-01 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #756 (Y: 82 N: 64 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2014-04-03 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #529 (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-28 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #593 (Y: 75 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2014-04-03 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #529 (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-28 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #593 (Y: 75 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-01 | House | (Placed in the Legislative Files. DEAD.) |
2014-05-01 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 756V 82 having voted in the affirmative and 64 in the negative, with 5 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Resolve not become law and the veto was sustained. |
2014-05-01 | House | This Resolve, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" |
2014-04-07 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence. |
2014-04-04 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-04-04 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-727) , in concurrence. |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-727) READ and ADOPTED |
2014-04-03 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 529 20 Yeas - 15 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent PREVAILED |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Subsequently, the Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED , in concurrence. |
2014-04-03 | Senate | TAKEN from the Table by the President. |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2014-03-31 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE of his motion to accept the Majority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-727) Report , in concurrence. |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Senator CLEVELAND of Androscoggin moved to ACCEPT the Majority OUGHT TO PASS AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-727) Report , in concurrence. |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Reports READ |
2014-03-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-03-28 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-727). |
2014-03-28 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Resolve was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2014-03-28 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-727) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2014-03-28 | House | The Resolve was READ ONCE. |
2014-03-28 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 593 (Yeas 75 - Nays 63 - Absent 13 - Excused 0) |
2014-03-28 | House | Subsequently, on motion of Representative HOBBINS of Saco, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2014-03-28 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2014-03-27 | House | Unfinished Business |
2014-03-26 | House | Unfinished Business |
2014-03-25 | House | Unfinished Business |
2014-03-25 | House | Later today assigned. |
2014-03-25 | House | On motion of Representative HOBBINS of Saco TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report. |
2014-03-25 | House | Reports READ. |
2013-07-10 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 126th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1145. |
2013-07-09 | House | Carried over to any special and/or regular session of the 126th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1145. |
2013-01-17 | Senate | On motion by Senator Cleveland of Androscoggin REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218, in concurrence. |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2013-01-15 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-01-15 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. |
2013-01-15 | House | Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2013-01-15 | House | Representative HOBBINS for the Public Utilities Commission pursuant to the Maine Revised Statutes, Title 5, section 8072, reports that the Resolve be REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY and printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. |