ME LD379 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on June 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Protect Children by Requiring the Safe Storage of Loaded Firearms

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Protect Children by Requiring the Safe Storage of Loaded Firearms

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-11 - Senate - Accept Maj Ontp Rpt RC #267 (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #204 (Y: 67 N: 64 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-11SenatePlaced in Legislative Files (DEAD)
2019-06-11SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 267 Yeas 23 - Nays 12 - Excused 0 - Absent 0
2019-06-11SenateSubsequently The Majority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED in concurrence
2019-06-11SenateTaken from the table by the President
2019-06-10SenateUnfinished Business
2019-06-10SenateOn further motion by same Senator TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending his motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report,
2019-06-10SenateSenator LIBBY of Androscoggin moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report.
2019-06-10SenateReports READ
2019-06-06HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-06HouseROLL CALL NO. 204 (Yeas 67 - Nays 64 - Absent 17 - Excused 2 Vacant 1)
2019-06-06HouseOn motion of Representative WARREN of Hallowell, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED.
2019-06-06HouseSpeaker laid before the House
2019-06-05HouseUnfinished Business
2019-06-04HouseUnfinished Business
2019-06-04HouseLater today assigned.
2019-06-04HouseOn further motion of same Representative TABLED pending her motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report.
2019-06-04HouseRepresentative WARREN of Hallowell moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report.
2019-06-04HouseReports READ.
2019-01-24SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY in concurrence
2019-01-24HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-01-24HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY.
2019-01-24HouseCommittee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback