ME LD377 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-12 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-12 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Allow Public Members of the Maine-Canadian Legislative Advisory Commission To Receive Reimbursement for Travel Expenses
Title
An Act To Allow Public Members of the Maine-Canadian Legislative Advisory Commission To Receive Reimbursement for Travel Expenses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-12 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2021-03-12 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-03-12 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2021-03-12 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2021-03-11 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-03-11 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2021-03-11 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2021-03-11 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2021-03-05 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP |
2021-03-01 | Joint | Voted: OTP |
2021-03-01 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on February 8, 2021 and REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |