ME LD37 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Allow for the Sale of Nonprescription Drugs through Vending Machines
Title
An Act To Allow for the Sale of Nonprescription Drugs through Vending Machines
Sponsors
Rep. Maureen Terry [D] | Rep. Joyce McCreight [D] | Sen. Linda Sanborn [D] | Rep. Rachel Talbot Ross [D] |
Rep. Denise Tepler [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-07 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #222 (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #199 (Y: 85 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #199 (Y: 85 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-06-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-10 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-466) in concurrence |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-466) READ and ADOPTED |
2019-06-07 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 222 Yeas 19 - Nays 13 - Excused 3 - Absent 0 |
2019-06-07 | Senate | On motion by Senator HERBIG of Waldo the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Reports Read |
2019-06-06 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-06 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-466). |
2019-06-06 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2019-06-06 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-466) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2019-06-06 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2019-06-06 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 199 (Yeas 85 - Nays 54 - Absent 9 - Excused 2 Vacant 1) |
2019-06-06 | House | On motion of Representative DAUGHTRY of Brunswick, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2019-06-06 | House | Reports READ. |
2019-01-09 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INNOVATION, DEVELOPMENT, ECONOMIC ADVANCEMENT AND BUSINESS in concurrence |
2019-01-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-01-09 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INNOVATION, DEVELOPMENT, ECONOMIC ADVANCEMENT AND BUSINESS. |
2019-01-09 | House | Committee on Innovation, Development, Economic Advancement and Commerce suggested and ordered printed. |