ME LD369 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act Authorizing Earned Employee Leave

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Authorizing Earned Employee Leave

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-08 - House - Acc Report 'a' Otp As Amend RC #75 (Y: 94 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2019-05-14HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-05-14HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2019-05-08HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-05-08HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-79).
2019-05-08HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2019-05-08HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (S-79) was READ and ADOPTED.
2019-05-08HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2019-05-08HouseROLL CALL NO. 75 (Yeas 94 - Nays 45 - Absent 10 - Excused 1 Vacant 1)
2019-05-08HouseOn motion of Representative SYLVESTER of Portland, REPORT A Ought to Pass as Amended was ACCEPTED.
2019-05-08HouseReports READ.
2019-05-07SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence
2019-05-07SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-79)
2019-05-07SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (S-79) READ and ADOPTED
2019-05-07SenateREAD ONCE
2019-05-07SenateOn motion by Senator BELLOWS of Kennebec the Report A Ought to Pass as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-79) ACCEPTED.
2019-05-07SenateReports Read
2019-01-24HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-01-24HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING.
2019-01-24SenateCommittee on LABOR AND HOUSING suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback