ME LD369 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-23 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-23 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Authorize the Sale of Surplus Property to Nonprofit Animal Shelters
Title
An Act To Authorize the Sale of Surplus Property to Nonprofit Animal Shelters
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-23 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence | |
2011-03-22 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-03-22 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2011-03-17 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME And PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED in concurrence | |
2011-03-17 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Rosen, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2011-03-16 | (S) Assigned for Second Reading next Legislative Day | |
2011-03-16 | (S) READ ONCE | |
2011-03-16 | (S) Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence | |
2011-03-15 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-03-15 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED | |
2011-03-15 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2011-03-15 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative RICHARDSON of Carmel, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2011-03-10 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | |
2011-02-08 | (S) On motion by Senator Thomas of Somerset, REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT and ordered printed, in concurrence. | |
2011-02-08 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-02-08 | (H) The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT. | |
2011-02-08 | (H) Committee on State and Local Government suggested and ordered printed. |