ME LD366 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Failed on June 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-13 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Ensure Compliance with Federal Immigration Law by State and Local Government Entities

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Ensure Compliance with Federal Immigration Law by State and Local Government Entities

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-13 - Senate - Accept Min Otp-a Rpt RC #296 (Y: 13 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-31 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #199 (Y: 77 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-13SenatePlaced in Legislative Files (DEAD)
2017-06-13SenateSubsequently The Majority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED in concurrence
2017-06-13SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 296 Yeas 13 - Nays 22 - Excused 0 - Absent 0
2017-06-13SenateSubsequently The Minority Ought to Pass As Amended Report FAILED
2017-06-13SenateTaken from the table by the President ProTem
2017-06-12SenateUnfinished Business
2017-06-09SenateUnfinished Business
2017-06-08SenateUnfinished Business
2017-06-07SenateUnfinished Business
2017-06-06SenateUnfinished Business
2017-06-05SenateUnfinished Business
2017-06-05SenateOn further motion by same Senator TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending her motion to ACCEPT the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report, In NON-CONCURRENCE
2017-06-05SenateSenator KEIM of Oxford moved to ACCEPT the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report.
2017-06-05SenateReports READ
2017-05-31HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-05-31HouseROLL CALL NO. 199 (Yeas 77 - Nays 59 - Absent 14 - Excused 1)
2017-05-31HouseOn motion of Representative MOONEN of Portland, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED.
2017-05-31HouseSpeaker laid before the House
2017-05-30HouseUnfinished Business
2017-05-30HouseLater today assigned.
2017-05-30HouseOn motion of Representative MOONEN of Portland, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report.
2017-05-30HouseReports READ.
2017-02-02SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY in concurrence
2017-02-02HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-02-02HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY.
2017-02-02HouseCommittee on Judiciary suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback