ME LD365 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-29 - LD 365 In Senate, April 29, 2016, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 34 In Favor and 0 Against, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-29 - LD 365 In Senate, April 29, 2016, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 34 In Favor and 0 Against, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Provide a Tax Reduction for Modifications To Make a Home More Accessible for a Person with a Disability
Title
An Act To Provide a Tax Reduction for Modifications To Make a Home More Accessible for a Person with a Disability
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-29 - Senate - Veto Override (2/3) RC #712 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-29 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #647 (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - Senate - Enactment RC #674 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - House - Recede And Concur RC #619 (Y: 116 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-08 - House - Enactment RC #169 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2016-04-29 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #647 (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - Senate - Enactment RC #674 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - House - Recede And Concur RC #619 (Y: 116 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-08 - House - Enactment RC #169 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-29 | Senate | LD 365 In Senate, April 29, 2016, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 34 In Favor and 0 Against, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN. |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 674 Yeas 35 - Nays 0 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 PREVAILED |
2016-04-14 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2016-04-13 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-04-13 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2016-04-13 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-04-13 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 619 (Yeas 116 - Nays 33 - Absent 2 - Excused 0) |
2016-04-13 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-277) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-490) thereto |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2016-04-13 | Senate | PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-277) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-490) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-277) As Amended By Senate Amendment "A" (S-490) thereto ADOPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2016-04-13 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-490) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-277) READ and ADOPTED |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Under further suspension of the Rules, On motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby Committee Amendment "A" (H-277) was ADOPTED |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford The Senate RECONSIDERED PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-277). |
2016-04-13 | Senate | On Motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2015-07-16 | House | Carried over from the Special Appropriations Table to any special or regular session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 555. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 555. |
2015-06-09 | Senate | On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending in concurrence. |
2015-06-08 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-08 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 169 (Yeas 139 - Nays 0 - Absent 12 - Excused 0) |
2015-06-08 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-277), in concurrence. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-277) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2015-06-03 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-03 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-277) |
2015-06-03 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2015-06-03 | House | Under suspension of the rules |
2015-06-03 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2015-02-12 | Senate | On motion by Senator McCormick of Kennebec, REFERRED to the Committee on Taxation, in concurrence. |
2015-02-12 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-02-12 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION. |
2015-02-12 | House | Committee on Taxation suggested and ordered printed. |