ME LD364 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-25 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-25 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Make Technical Changes to the Laws Governing Child Support
Title
An Act To Make Technical Changes to the Laws Governing Child Support
Sponsors
Rep. Barbara Cardone [D] | Sen. Dawn Hill [D] | Sen. Roger Katz [R] | Rep. Joyce McCreight [D] |
Rep. Roger Sherman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-25 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2017-04-20 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-04-20 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith |
2017-04-18 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2017-04-11 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-04-11 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2017-04-11 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2017-04-11 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2017-02-02 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY in concurrence |
2017-02-02 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-02-02 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY. |
2017-02-02 | House | Committee on Judiciary suggested and ordered printed. |