ME LD363 | 2009-2010 | 124th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Failed on March 25 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-25 - (S) Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Failed on March 25 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-25 - (S) Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Summary
An Act To Allow State Agencies To Acquire and Sell Carbon Credits under the Regional Greenhouse Gas Initiative
Title
An Act To Allow State Agencies To Acquire and Sell Carbon Credits under the Regional Greenhouse Gas Initiative
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-25 | (S) Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) | |
2009-02-12 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-02-12 | (H) Bill REFERRED to the Committee on NATURAL RESOURCES. | |
2009-02-10 | (S) Sent down for concurrence | |
2009-02-10 | (S) On motion by Senator HOBBINS of York REFERRED to the Committee on NATURAL RESOURCES | |
2009-02-10 | (S) Taken from the table by the President | |
2009-02-05 | (S) Unfinished Business | |
2009-02-05 | (S) On motion by Senator HOBBINS of York Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending REFERENCE | |
2009-02-05 | (S) Committee on Utilities and Energy suggested and ordered printed. |